US HB4319 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fairness to Veterans for Infrastructure Investment Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairness to Veterans for Infrastructure Investment Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2017-11-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HB277 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB1543 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2655 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HB5236 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB5785 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6258 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 612.
HB6603 (Related) 2018-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1 (Related) 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
SB584 (Related) 2017-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 284.
SB791 (Related) 2018-12-19 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-435.
SB1405 (Related) 2018-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
SB2786 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3606 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback