US HB432 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the conveyance of the Contra Costa Canal and the Rock Slough fish screen facility from the Department of the Interior to the Contra Costa Water District in California.
Title
Contra Costa Canal Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB93 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S143-144)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB93 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S143-144)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Fishes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Fishes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/432/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr432/BILLS-116hr432ih.pdf |