US HB4322 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes marijuana from a Schedule I to a Schedule III controlled substance, which allows it to be dispensed, subject to certain limitations, for accepted medical uses with a written or oral prescription.The bill also requires the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to collaborate with specified agencies to develop a national cannabis research agenda that must address (1) the therapeutic benefits of cannabis, (2) how it effects specified populations, (3) its long-term effects, (4) clinically appropriate methods to deliver it to the body, and (5) other public safety considerations. Additionally, the bill directs NIH to designate centers of excellence in cannabis research at institutions of higher education to conduct interdisciplinary research about biomedical, behavioral, and social issued related to cannabis.Further, the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention must work with other agencies to collect population-wide data about cannabis use, including (1) demographic factors, (2) health outcomes, (3) health care utilization rates, (4) product variety, (5) delivery methods, and (6) other relevant health information.
Title
Expanding Cannabis Research and Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2400 (Same As) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5253-5254)
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical research
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical research
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4322/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4322/BILLS-116hr4322ih.pdf |