US HB4328 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Innocent Consumers Affected by a Shutdown Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Innocent Consumers Affected by a Shutdown Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22.
2019-09-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-09-13HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback