US HB4329 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an issuer of securities to annually disclose to shareholders certain environmental, social, and governance metrics and their connection to the long-term business strategy of the issuer. The bill also establishes the Sustainable Finance Advisory Committee that must, among other things, recommend to the Securities and Exchange Commission policies to facilitate the flow of capital towards environmentally sustainable investments.
Title
ESG Disclosure Simplification Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290. |
2020-01-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-365. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 22. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Business ethics
Business records
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Finance and financial sector
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Business ethics
Business records
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Finance and financial sector
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)