US HB4335 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain issuers of securities to create policies reasonably designed to prevent executive officers and directors from trading their securities after a significant corporate event but before disclosing that event through a public filing. Certain issuers required by regulation to adopt a code of ethics are exempt from this requirement.
Title
8-K Trading Gap Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 14 (Y: 384 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 7 (Roll no. 14). (text: CR H188) |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H201-202) |
2020-01-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4335. |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H188-189) |
2020-01-13 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 52 - 0. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2488 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Securities
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Securities