US HB4345 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Park Service, if the State of Virginia offers to convey 44 acres of identified land in Virginia, to add and administer the land as part of the Fort Monroe National Monument. As part of such conveyance, Virginia may reserve and retain its rights under any leases in existence on the land on the day before conveyance.
Title
Fort Monroe National Monument Land Acquisition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2329 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Virginia
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4345/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4345/BILLS-116hr4345ih.pdf |