US HB4348 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 129-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nullifies the 2019 rules relating to the listing of endangered or threatened species and the designation of critical habitats. Among other things, the restored rules automatically give threatened species the same protections as endangered species; revise requirements governing when an agency must consult with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service or the National Marine Fisheries Service about endangered species, threatened species, or their habitats; prohibit economic assessments from being considered in listing decisions; and revise the criteria used for designating critical habitats for the species.
Title
PAW and FIN Conservation Act of 2019 Protect America’s Wildlife and Fish In Need of Conservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376. |
2020-08-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-469. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 16. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2491 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection