US HB4351 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain Community Development Block Grant program recipients to submit to the Department of Housing and Urban Development information regarding their implementation of certain land-use policies (e.g., policies for reducing minimum lot size).
Title
Yes In My Backyard Act
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1431) |
2020-03-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4351. |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1430-1432) |
2020-03-02 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1919 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Building construction
Historic sites and heritage areas
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Public transit
Historic sites and heritage areas
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Public transit