US HB4358 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to (1) submit to Congress a report describing the preliminary damage assessment process, as supported by FEMA in the five years before this bill's enactment; and (2) establish a training regime within FEMA to ensure preliminary damage assessments are conducted and reviewed under consistent guidelines. FEMA shall annually submit to Congress a report on the number and type of instances under which FEMA personnel have overturned decisions made by personnel in the field.
Title
Preliminary Damage Assessment Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5858) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4358. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5858-5859) |
2020-11-17 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-575. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement