US HB4381 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Planning for American Energy Act of 2012 - Amends the Mineral Leasing Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior (the Secretary) and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to publish every four years a Quadrennial Federal Onshore Energy Production Strategy to direct federal land energy development and department resource allocation in order to promote the energy security of the United States. Instructs the Secretary to consult with the Administrator of the Energy Information Administration on the projected energy demands of the United States for the next 30 years and on how energy derived from federal onshore lands can put the United States on a trajectory that meets such demand during the next 4 years, with a goal for increasing energy independence and production. Requires the Secretary to determine a domestic strategic production objective for the development of energy resources from such lands. Expresses the sense of Congress that federally recognized Indian tribes may elect to set their own production objectives as part of the Strategy. Grants the relevant Secretary all necessary authority to make determinations regarding which additional federal lands available for leasing at the time the lease sale occurs will be available to meet the production objectives established by the strategies. Directs the Secretary to also take all necessary actions to achieve such objectives unless the President determines that it is not in U.S. national security and economic interests to increase federal domestic energy production and to further decrease dependence upon foreign energy sources. Requires the Secretary, within 12 months of this Act's enactment, to complete a programmatic environmental impact statement in accordance with certain requirements under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA). Deems such statement sufficient to be in compliance with NEPA requirements for all necessary resource management and land use plans associated with implementation of the Strategy. Requires the Secretary to submit to: (1) the President and Congress, each proposed strategy, together with comments received from the affected states, federally recognized tribes, and local governments prior to publishing it; and (2) Congress the first Strategy within 18 months of enactment.
Title
Planning for American Energy Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378. |
2012-06-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-530. |
2012-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2012-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2012-04-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2012-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4480 (Related) 2012-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Coal
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Indian lands and resources rights
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
Coal
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Indian lands and resources rights
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources