US HB439 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-7. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-7. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the charter of the National FFA Organization (Future Farmers of America). Such revisions include (1) making it a purpose of the organization to be an integral component of agricultural education, and (2) removing the Secretary of Education as the chair of the National FFA Board of Directors.
Title
National FFA Organization's Federal Charter Amendments Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-7. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-02-12 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S873) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H964-966) |
2019-01-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 439. |
2019-01-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H964-967) |
2019-01-22 | House | Mr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Agricultural education
Congress
Elementary and secondary education
Federally chartered organizations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Congress
Elementary and secondary education
Federally chartered organizations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress