US HB4405 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Women's Business Center Program through FY2023, raises the cap on individual center grants, establishes an accreditation program for grant recipients, and revises the duties of the Office of Women's Business Ownership. Specifically, the bill modifies the Women's Business Center Program to enable the Small Business Administration (SBA) to provide initial and continuation grants to eligible entities to operate women's business centers for the benefit of women-owned small businesses. An entity must agree to obtain matching, non-federal funds, and the SBA must (1) ensure an applicant has sufficient resources to provide the services for which the grant is being made, and (2) conduct an annual compliance review. The SBA must also publish standards for a program to accredit entities that receive grants from the Women's Business Center Program, and such entities' receipt of continuation grants shall be contingent upon their obtaining accreditation.
Title
Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-10-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8268-8272) |
2019-10-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4405. |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8268-8274) |
2019-10-21 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190. |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-239. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business education
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Small business
Small Business Administration
Women in business
Business education
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Small business
Small Business Administration
Women in business