US HB4406 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Small Business Development Center Program through FY2023 and otherwise revises the program. Specifically, the bill (1) generally prohibits entities other than institutions of higher education from receiving grants under the program; (2) allows centers to collect fees related to partnerships or sponsorships; (3) authorizes centers to market their services directly to small businesses; and (4) modifies or establishes provisions related to program funding, operations, data collection, and reporting.
Title
Small Business Development Centers Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 569 (Y: 375 N: 25 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-10-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 25 (Roll no. 569). (text: CR H8266-8267) |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8280-8281) |
2019-10-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4406. |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8266-8268) |
2019-10-21 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 191. |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-240. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Marketing and advertising
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Small business
User charges and fees
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Marketing and advertising
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Small business
User charges and fees