US HB4407 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2022 the Service Corps of Retired Executives (SCORE) program, outlines the duties of the SCORE Association, and requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to cooperate with the association to carry out the program. Specifically, the bill requires the association to manage nationwide chapters of the program to enable volunteers participating in the program to provide personal, cost-free business expertise and facilitate education workshops to small businesses. The association must also offer online counseling through web-based platforms to small businesses. In consultation with the association, the SBA must ensure that the program (1) recruits diverse volunteers for each chapter of the program, and (2) provides services to rural and underserved communities.
Title
SCORE for Small Business Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 570 (Y: 389 N: 8 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-10-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 8 (Roll no. 570). (text: CR H8274-8275) |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8281) |
2019-10-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-21 | House | DEBATE - The House continued with further debate on H.R. 4407. |
2019-10-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4407. |
2019-10-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8274-8277) |
2019-10-21 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 192. |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-241. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Business education
Business records
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Performance measurement
Right of privacy
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wages and earnings
Business education
Business records
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Performance measurement
Right of privacy
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wages and earnings