US HB4434 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Appalachian Regional Commission through FY2025.
Title
Appalachian Regional Commission Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2273 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Appalachian Regional Commission
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Regional and metropolitan planning
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4434/BILLS-116hr4434ih.pdf |