US HB444 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Unemployment for Veterans of All Ages Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Unemployment for Veterans of All Ages Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback