US HB4462 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the National Telecommunications and Information Administration to establish a research and development program focused on facilitating the sharing among federal entities of the electromagnetic spectrum that is allocated for use by such entities. In addition, the Federal Communications Commission must issue a report with recommendations for expanding upon and improving spectrum sharing techniques for use in mid-band frequencies.
Title
Studying How to Harness Airwave Resources Efficiently Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5000 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4462/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4462/BILLS-116hr4462ih.pdf |