US HB4465 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill extends through FY2023 the authority of the Department of the Interior to use power revenues collected pursuant to the Colorado River Storage Project Act for annual base funding of endangered fish recovery implementation programs for the Upper Colorado and San Juan River Basins. (Sec. 3) Additionally, Interior must submit to Congress a report that describes the accomplishments and costs of the recovery implementation programs.
Title
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 103 (Y: 392 N: 6 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 6 (Roll no. 103). (text: CR H1515) |
2018-03-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1529) |
2018-03-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-03-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4465. |
2018-03-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1515-1516) |
2018-03-13 | House | Mr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 428. |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-567. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-12-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-11-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9438) |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2166 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Arizona
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Arizona
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection