US HB4478 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the application process, eligibility requirements, and certain calculations related to the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA). Specifically, the bill establishes three pathways for FAFSA applicants to submit income or asset information; establishes a certification process whereby a student who submits an initial FAFSA, and who certifies in the subsequent year that their dependency status has not changed, shall not be required to submit another FAFSA to maintain aid eligibility; requires the Department of Education (ED) to make the FAFSA form available in multiple languages and in formats that are accessible to individual with disabilities; repeals provisions that make ineligible for federal student aid any individual who fails to register with selective service or has committed drug-related offenses; prohibits ED from asking questions relating to whether an applicant for federal student aid has committed any drug-related offenses; expands eligibility for federal student aid to certain students who entered the United States prior to age 16; increases support for working students; requires ED to assign an applicant an expected family contribution of zero in certain situations (e.g., if the student received a federal means-tested benefit such as Medicaid during the previous twenty-four months); and requires ED to use data from the second preceding tax year to simplify the application process and determination of financial aid eligibility.
Title
Simple FAFSA Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-09-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1196) |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4216 (Related) 2019-08-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4240 (Related) 2019-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4478 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB4787 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8748 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4240 (Related) 2019-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4478 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB4787 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8748 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigrant health and welfare
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigrant health and welfare
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4478/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4478/BILLS-116hr4478ih.pdf |