US HB4500 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Commerce to assist trusted companies (i.e., companies determined to pose no national security threat) and relevant stakeholders with participation in organizations that set standards for telecommunications, wireless devices, and related equipment.
Title
Promoting United States Wireless Leadership Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H46-47) |
2020-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4500. |
2020-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H46-49) |
2020-01-08 | House | Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-01-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291. |
2020-01-07 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2020-01-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-367, Part I. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4463 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB3311 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3311 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
International organizations and cooperation
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication