US HB451 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the Federal Communications Commission to reallocate and auction the 470-512 MHz band (referred to as the "T-Band spectrum"). The T-Band spectrum is a frequency range currently utilized by public-safety entities in certain urban areas.
Title
Don't Break Up the T-Band Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 410 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-09-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 5 (Roll no. 201). (text: CR 9/21/2020 H4614-4615) |
2020-09-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4773-4774) |
2020-09-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 451. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4614-4616) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mr. McNerney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-521. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2748 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2165 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB5928 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2165 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB5928 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Radio spectrum allocation
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication