US HB4520 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a tax on the greenhouse gas emissions of fossil fuels, certain industrial processes, and certain product uses. The bill appropriates and transfers specified revenue from the tax to a Rebuilding Infrastructure and Solutions for the Environment Trust Fund (RISE Trust Fund) established by the bill. Specified amounts in the trust fund shall be available, as provided by appropriations Acts, for the federal Highway Trust Fund, grants to low-income households; and other specified energy, environmental, infrastructure, and research and development priorities. The bill also eliminates the federal motor vehicle and aviation fuel taxes, modifies the tax credit for carbon capture and storage and the qualifying advanced coal project tax credit, imposes a moratorium on finalizing and enforcing certain Clean Air Act regulations on greenhouse gas emissions, and establishes a National Climate Commission to review policies to reduce greenhouse gas emissions. The moratorium on regulations expires in 2033 if specified emission targets are not reached.
Title
MARKET CHOICE Act Modernizing America with Rebuilding to Kickstart the Economy of the Twenty-first Century with a Historic Infrastructure-Centered Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4058 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Floods and storm protection
Government trust funds
Income tax credits
Industrial facilities
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Manufacturing
Metals
Mining
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Unemployment
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employment and training programs
Environmental health
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Floods and storm protection
Government trust funds
Income tax credits
Industrial facilities
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Manufacturing
Metals
Mining
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4520/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4520/BILLS-116hr4520ih.pdf |