US HB4524 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make permanent the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to transport individuals to and from facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs in connection with rehabilitation, counseling, examination, treatment, and care, and for other purposes.
Title
Rural Veterans Travel Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5074 (Related) 2019-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB2966 (Same As) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB850 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB2966 (Same As) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB850 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4524/BILLS-116hr4524ih.pdf |