US HB4526 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes the notice the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) must provide in the event a person submits a claim for damage, injury, or death on Standard Form 95 (related to tort claims occurring within the scope of an employee's federal employment). Specifically, the VA must provide to the claimant, within 30 days after the claim is submitted, notice of (1) the importance of securing legal counsel, and (2) the employment status of any individual listed on the form. Additionally, if the claim involves a contractor that entered into an agreement with the VA, the VA must provide the claimant notice of the statute of limitations regarding the claim in the state in which the claim arose.
Title
Brian Tally VA Employment Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4883 (Related) 2020-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Civil actions and liability
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Government liability
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
Public contracts and procurement
State and local courts
Veterans' medical care
Civil actions and liability
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Government liability
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
Public contracts and procurement
State and local courts
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4526/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4526/BILLS-116hr4526ih.pdf |