US HB4533 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-132. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-132. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the health care system of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Lexington VA Health Care System" and to make certain other designations. (Sec. 2) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs: (1) health care system in Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Lexington VA Health Care System," (2) health care facility at 1101 Veterans Drive, Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Troy Bowling Campus," and (3) health care facility at 2250 Leestown Road, Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Franklin R. Sousley Campus."
Title
To designate the health care system of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Lexington VA Health Care System" and to make certain other designations.
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 70 (Y: 402 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-132. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1191) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 70). (text: CR H1081-1082) |
2018-02-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1103-1104) |
2018-02-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4533. |
2018-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1081-1083) |
2018-02-13 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |