US HB4560 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GSE Jumpstart Reauthorization Act of 2017
Title
GSE Jumpstart Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-648. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 27. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |