US HB4564 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the requirements for the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline Program. Specifically, the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration must (1) develop a plan to ensure the provision of high quality service, (2) strengthen data-sharing agreements to facilitate the transmission of epidemiological data from the program to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, and (3) implement a pilot program focused on using other communications platforms (e.g., social media and texting) for suicide prevention. The bill also directs the Government Accountability Office to study the program.
Title
Suicide Prevention Lifeline Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4630) |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4564. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4630-4631) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 417. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-517. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Internet and video services
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Telephone and wireless communication
Emergency communications systems
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Internet and video services
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Telephone and wireless communication