US HB4570 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ending Forced Arbitration of Sexual Harassment Act This bill prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of a sex discrimination dispute.
Title
Ending Forced Arbitration of Sexual Harassment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB537 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2203 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4734 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB537 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2203 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4734 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Law
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Law
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4570/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4570/BILLS-115hr4570ih.pdf |