US HB458 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nullifies a rule by the Departments of the Treasury, Labor, and Health and Human Services regarding short-term, limited-duration health insurance plans that was published on October 31, 2016. The departments must use the definition of short-term, limited-duration insurance in use immediately prior to publication of the rule. (The rule requires the duration of short-term, limited-duration insurance to be less than three months, including renewals. Previously, such insurance was required to expire less than 12 months after its effective date.) Short-term, limited-duration health insurance plans are plans that may only offer coverage for a limited amount of time under law and that are exempt from the market requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (e.g., coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions). On August 3, 2018, the departments issued a revised rule that increases the maximum authorized duration of such plans from less than 3 months (including renewals) to an initial maximum duration of less than 12 months (with a total duration of up to 36 months, including renewals). The rule took effect October 2, 2018.
Title
Affordable Limited Health Coverage Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Labor
Department of the Treasury
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr458/BILLS-116hr458ih.pdf |