US HB46 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to disburse to recipients of Social Security benefits or certain other federal benefits a $250 payment in years where no cost-of-living adjustment (COLA) is made. Individuals entitled to more than one such benefit shall receive only one $250 payment in a non-COLA year. A non-COLA payment shall not be counted as income for determining eligibility for federal assistance or for taxation purposes.
Title
Social Security Safety Dividend Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Inflation and prices
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Employee benefits and pensions
Inflation and prices
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/46/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr46/BILLS-116hr46ih.pdf |