US HB4611 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements under the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (NPDES) permit program for the Point Loma Wastewater Treatment Plant in San Diego, California. Currently, the plant must meet standards established under the NPDES permit program for the primary and secondary treatment of wastewater discharged by the plant into marine waters. The city of San Diego may apply for permit modifications, which offer alternatives to certain secondary treatment standards. eliminates the need for the city to obtain a separate permit for such modifications. Instead, the city may apply to obtain the permit modifications under the main NPDES permit if the plant meets certain conditions, such as the implementation of a pretreatment program.
Title
Ocean Pollution Reduction Act II
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 395 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 4 (Roll no. 221). (text: CR H5849-5850) |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2020-11-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4611. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5849-5851) |
2020-11-17 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 474. |
2020-11-16 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-576, Part I. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
California
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Licensing and registrations
Marine pollution
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Licensing and registrations
Marine pollution
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply