US HB4613 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

VA Reporting Transparency Act This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish and maintain a website that allows the public to obtain electronic copies of all legislatively requested reports required to be submitted after the date of the enactment of this bill. Information, records, and reports that are exempt from public disclosure are not required to be included on the website. If Congress exempts a report from publication, the VA must publish on the website the title of the report and notice that Congress exempted the report from publication. The VA must submit a report to Congress recommending which recurring legislatively requested reports should be discontinued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA Reporting Transparency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-02-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1179)
2020-02-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4613.
2020-02-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1179-1180)
2020-02-25HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
2019-10-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2019-10-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-10-04HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback