US HB4625 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protect the GI Bill Act This bill imposes requirements and restrictions on educational institutions participating in the educational assistance programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). The bill limits participation in VA educational assistance programs if an educational institution (1) does not perform specified actions, such as providing cost information to individuals prior to enrollment; (2) implements fraudulent recruiting techniques or pays inducements to secure enrollments; or (3) is the subject of a negative action by its accrediting agency. The state approving agency or the VA shall impose limitations by publishing a warning or temporarily prohibiting the pursuit of a course of education at an institution. The bill provides for waivers of certain requirements for a one-year period, but waivers may not be provided for more than two consecutive academic years. The bill also prohibits the VA from approving the enrollment of an eligible veteran or eligible person in any course offered by an institution engaged in substantial misrepresentation (e.g., misrepresenting the size, location, facilities, or equipment of the institution). Finally, the bill modifies the criteria that non-accredited courses must meet to be eligible for educational assistance. The bill adds requirements for (1) the educational institution offering the course to refrain from substantial misrepresentation; and (2) the state approving agency to review advertising, sales, or enrollment materials used by the institution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect the GI Bill Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-11-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8746-8749)
2019-11-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4625.
2019-11-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8746-8751)
2019-11-12HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
2019-10-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-10-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-10-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4312 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback