US HB4634 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-20)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes through 2030 the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program within the Department of the Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Terrorism Risk Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]

Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 626 (Y: 385 N: 22 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-11-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 22 (Roll no. 626). (text: CR H8932-8933)
2019-11-18HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8940-8941)
2019-11-18HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-11-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4634.
2019-11-18HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8932-8937)
2019-11-18HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-31HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
2019-10-31HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-10-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback