US HB4650 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands Medicare coverage to include dentures and dental and oral health services, in accordance with specified limitations. Covered services include basic and major treatments (as determined by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services) as well as specified preventive and screening services.
Title
Medicare Dental Coverage Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303. |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-325, Part II. |
2019-12-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-325, Part I. |
2019-10-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-25 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Dental care
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare