US HB4661 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8207)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8207)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain Medicaid enrollees automatically qualify for low-income subsidies under the Medicare prescription drug benefit. Specifically, the bill automatically qualifies individuals who were enrolled in Medicaid before they turned 65 (as part of Medicaid expansion under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act) and whose income is below 200% of the federal poverty line.
Title
Advancing Enrollment and Reducing Drug Costs Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8207) |
2019-10-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4661/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4661/BILLS-116hr4661ih.pdf |