US HB4671 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alters eligibility standards and related processes for several programs that provide premium and cost-sharing assistance to low-income Medicare beneficiaries. Among other things, the bill expands income eligibility for the Qualified Medicare Beneficiary Program and the Specified Low-Income Medicare Beneficiary Program to up to 135% and 200% of the federal poverty level (FPL), respectively, and provides an enhanced Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (i.e., federal matching rate) to state Medicaid programs for expenditures related to the expansion. The bill also repeals the Qualifying Individual Program (which currently provides premium assistance to beneficiaries with incomes between 120% and 135% of the FPL).
Title
Helping Seniors Afford Health Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 305. |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-381, Part I. |
2019-10-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8141) |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-25 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wages and earnings
Disability assistance
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Wages and earnings