US HB4672 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-238. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-238. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 21701 Stevens Creek Boulevard in Cupertino, California, as the "Petty Officer 2nd Class (SEAL) Matthew G. Axelson Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 21701 Stevens Creek Boulevard in Cupertino, California, as the "Petty Officer 2nd Class (SEAL) Matthew G. Axelson Post Office Building".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-238. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4357) |
2020-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4672. |
2020-09-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4357-4358) |
2020-09-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service