US HB4679 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 527.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 527.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Government Accountability Office to examine efforts by the Regional Fishery Management Councils, the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission, and the National Marine Fisheries Service to prepare and adapt fisheries for the impacts of climate change.
Title
Climate-Ready Fisheries Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 527. |
2020-12-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-642. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5548 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources