US HB4712 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to limitations on exclusive approval or licensure of orphan drugs, and for other purposes.
Title
Fairness in Orphan Drug Exclusivity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5807) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4712. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5807-5809) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 470. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-572. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3271 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Competition and antitrust
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Health
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs