US HB4719 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2021 and expands the Department of Health and Human Services fishing safety training and research grant programs. The bill increases the maximum federal share of the costs of any activity that may be carried out using grants under the programs to 75%. Currently, the federal share must not exceed 50%. This change is retroactive to December 5, 2018. The U.S. Coast Guard shall properly mark all pierheads belonging to the United States that are located in certain lakes. Additionally, the bill prohibits (1) the Coast Guard from being involved with the installation of lighthouses, and (2) construction of lighthouses, beacons, public piers, or landmarks on any site until a cession of jurisdiction over the same has been made to the United States. The bill eliminates outdated provisions related to the U.S. Lighthouse Service, which was merged into the Coast Guard.
Title
FISH SAFE Act Funding Instruction for Safety, Health, and Security Avoids Fishing Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10278-10279) |
2019-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10602) |
2019-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Fletcher objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4719. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10278-10280) |
2019-12-16 | House | Mrs. Fletcher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 271. |
2019-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-340. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1410 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Coast guard
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health