US HB4727 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the mentor-protégé program of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) under which a mentor firm enters into an agreement with a protégé firm to assist the latter to compete for prime contracts and subcontracts of DHS.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Mentor-Protege Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579. |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-287. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9370-9371) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4727. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9370-9371) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Slotkin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 251. |
2019-11-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-310. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4251 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority education
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Department of Homeland Security
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority education
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business