US HB4739 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 460.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to implement a safety framework to protect its personnel from exposure to potential synthetic opioids. Among other things, the CBP must do the following: issue a policy that specifies protocols and procedures for the safe handling of potential synthetic opioids; require mandatory training on the potential risk of exposure to and safe handling procedures for synthetic opioids, as well as how to administer opioid receptor antagonists (e.g., naloxone) after exposure; and provide personal protective equipment and opioid receptor antagonists to officers, agents, other personnel, and canines at risk of exposure to synthetic opioids.
Title
Synthetic Opioid Exposure Prevention and Training Act
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 656 (Y: 393 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 460. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-229. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 656). (text: CR H9369) |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9381-9382) |
2019-12-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4739. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9369-9370) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 259. |
2019-12-03 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-318, Part I. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3345 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Law enforcement officers
Mammals
Service animals
Worker safety and health
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Law enforcement officers
Mammals
Service animals
Worker safety and health