US HB477 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of the James J. Howard Marine Science Laboratory at Gateway National Recreation Area in New Jersey, without consideration, to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration by the state of New Jersey and sets forth new requirements governing the continued use of the laboratory.
Title
To amend section 7 of Public Law 100-515 (16 U.S.C. 1244 note) to promote continued use of the James J. Howard Marine Sciences Laboratory at Gateway National Recreation Area by the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New Jersey
Public lands and natural resources
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New Jersey
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/477/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr477/BILLS-116hr477ih.pdf |