US HB4779 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2027 the U.S. SAFE WEB Act of 2006, which permits the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to take certain actions to protect consumers from cross-border fraud and deception occurring over the internet. The bill further requires the FTC to report on its activities concerning cross-border, online fraud and provide any policy recommendations to address such fraud.
Title
To extend the Undertaking Spam, Spyware, And Fraud Enforcement With Enforcers beyond Borders Act of 2006, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5851-5852) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10286) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4779. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10286-10287) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 280. |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-351. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-10-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3132 (Same As) 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration