US HB4801 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and reauthorizes through FY2024 the Healthy Start program, which provides grants that support interventions to improve women’s health before, during, and after pregnancy. Further, the bill requires the Health Resources and Services Administration to consider communities with high rates of infant mortality when awarding grants and requires the Government Accountability Office to evaluate the program’s health outcomes.
Title
Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2619 (Same As) 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Performance measurement
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Performance measurement
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4801/BILLS-116hr4801ih.pdf |