US HB4806 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to authorize the debarment of certain registrants, and for other purposes.
Title
DEBAR Act of 2020 Debarment Enforcement of Bad Actor Registrants Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5818) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4806. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5818-5819) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 483. |
2020-11-16 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-585, Part I. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.