US HB4814 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve reporting of the distribution of controlled substances, and for other purposes.
Title
Suspicious Order Identification Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2686 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Intergovernmental relations
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Intergovernmental relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4814/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4814/BILLS-116hr4814ih.pdf |