US HB4821 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Medicaid coverage for citizens of the Freely Associated States (the Federated States of Micronesia, the Republic of the Marshall Islands, and the Republic of Palau) lawfully residing in the United States under the Compacts of Free Association.
Title
Covering our FAS Allies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2218 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1425 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
SB4509 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1425 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 523.
SB4509 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
Subjects
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Foreign aid and international relief
Guam
Health
Marshall Islands
Medicaid
Micronesia
Northern Mariana Islands
Oceania
Palau
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Caribbean area
Foreign aid and international relief
Guam
Health
Marshall Islands
Medicaid
Micronesia
Northern Mariana Islands
Oceania
Palau
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4821/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4821/BILLS-116hr4821ih.pdf |